THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:54:08 AM
Kaicker, Navin
CPSO#:
81020
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1081 Burrard St
Vancouver BC V6Z 1Y6
Phone: 604-806-9090
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVIN KAICKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAICKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2015 |