THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:48:06 AM
Golisky, Jeffrey Mark
CPSO#:
81015
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103 P O Box 790
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-7956
Fax: (705) 526-6287
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:03 Nov 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY MARK GOLISKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLISKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2006 |