THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:46:13 PM
Cook, Douglas James
CPSO#:
81003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Room 304 Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3696
Fax: (613) 548-1346
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D.J. Cook Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JAMES COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |