THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:22:29 AM
Colby, Joshua
CPSO#:
81002
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
403 Picton Main St
Prince Edward County Memorial Hospi
Picton ON K0K 2T0
Phone: 613-4761008
Fax: 6134768600
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:26 Oct 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSHUA COLBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLBY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2007 |