THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:42:52 AM
Badiwala, Mitesh Vallabh
CPSO#:
80994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamouda Bin Ali Al Dhaheri Street
Cleveland Clinic Abu Dhabi
Heart, Vascular and Thoracic Instit
C-08-274
Aboudhabi
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +971562731606
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mitesh Badiwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MITESH VALLABH BADIWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADIWALA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2014 |