THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:19:17 AM
Del Sorbo, Lorenzo
CPSO#:
80984
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Turin, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Critical Care Medicine - ICU
11Pmb-122
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3601
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:22 Aug 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:10 Aug 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 18 Aug 2016
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |