THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:58:58 PM
Greavette, Thomas Ford
CPSO#:
80971
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health System - St Catharin
Department of Surgery
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy/transfer of their medical record can contact DocuDavit Solutions: Toll Free 1-888-781-9083, Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 13 Nov 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS FORD GREAVETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREAVETTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2008 |