THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:10:34 PM
Rahnema, Nazanine
CPSO#:
80961
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Saberi & Rahnema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:26 Oct 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jun 2009 |