THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:08:27 PM
Ho, Esther Ching Yee
CPSO#:
80938
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Endersby & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2012
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Aug 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 May 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |