THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:56:27 AM
Belhaj, Abdelbaset
CPSO#:
80931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7442
Fax: (416) 281-7384
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:23 Sep 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDELBASET BELHAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELHAJ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 09 Jul 2004
PEAP - R - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 10 Jul 2004 to 13 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 14 Jul 2005 to 13 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 14 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 13 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 14 Jul 2007 to 13 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 14 Jul 2008 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2009 |