THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:16:58 AM
Faghfoury, Hannaneh
CPSO#:
80910
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Fred A Litwin Family Centre
for Genetic Medicine
60 Murray St, BOX 34
3rd floor, room 400
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4220
Fax: (416) 619-5523
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hannaneh Faghfoury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 7 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANNANEH FAGHFOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAGHFOURY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |