THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:44:06 AM
Hamoudi, Aseel Zuhair
CPSO#:
80904
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1280 main street west , HSC 2F
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76248
Fax: (905) 577-0471
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASEEL ZUHAIR HAMOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMOUDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2011 |