THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:07:50 PM
Hiremath, Swapnil Satayya
CPSO#:
80903
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Site
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82762
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nephrology |
Effective:01 Jul 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 31 May 2004 to 04 Jul 2004
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
|
Active |