THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:50:12 PM
Disperati, Patricia
CPSO#:
80901
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Catolica do Parana, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416 469 3325
Fax: 416 469 6420
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:28 Feb 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA DISPERATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DISPERATI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 16 Aug 2004
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 Jun 2006
CF - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2010 |