THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:11:40 PM
McGregor, Thomas Brian
CPSO#:
80894
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Thomas Brian McGregor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 29 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 May 2023 |