THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:37:58 AM
Alvi, Mansour Isalou
CPSO#:
80889
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Isalou Alvi, Mansour (used until: 11 Jan 2009 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1131A Leslie St
North York ON M3C 3L8
Phone: 416-757-2873
Fax: 416-510-2873
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Texas
USA - West Virginia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANSOUR ISALOU ALVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |