THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:13:47 AM
Turcotte, Marie Laurina
CPSO#:
80885
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
65 Third St
Niagara Health System
Emergency Medicine
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.L. Turcotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2011
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE LAURINA TURCOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURCOTTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2015 |