THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:36:03 AM
Hsia, Ivan Kai-Hsiang
CPSO#:
80881
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital - Wilson
Department of Anaesthesiology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 48000
Fax: 416-242-1069
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IVAN KAI-HSIANG HSIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |