THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:50:05 AM
Makhija, Sapna
CPSO#:
80843
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 335-1888
Fax: (905) 335-5656
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:02 Oct 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAPNA MAKHIJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKHIJA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 24 Jun 2004
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2006 to 24 Sep 2006
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2007 |