THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:14:03 PM
Van Lieshout, Ryan John
CPSO#:
80838
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Womens Health Concerns Clinic
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street, Room C142
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35123
Fax: (905) 381-5629
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RYAN JOHN VAN LIESHOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN LIESHOUT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |