THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:31:28 AM
Leahy, Natalie Christine
CPSO#:
80827
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Baine, Natalie Christine (used until: 13 Nov 2005 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
PRHC Cancer Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 740-8326
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences |
Whitby |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Mar 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIE CHRISTINE LEAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2007 |