THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:23:00 PM
Henderson, Tamara Amy
CPSO#:
80810
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAMARA AMY HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 16 Dec 2008 to 15 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 16 Dec 2009 to 15 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2010 |