THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:57:45 AM
Easo, Hyacinth Sarah Eapen
CPSO#:
80797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
John, Hyacinth Sarah Eapen (used until: 05 Feb 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital Freeport Site
P O Box 9056
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7013
Fax: (519) 894-8308
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HYACINTH SARAH EAPEN EASO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |