THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:01:08 AM
Donovan, Jeffrey Cecil Henry
CPSO#:
80771
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Donovan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Donovan Hair Clinic
905 - 750 West Broadway
Vancouver BC V5Z 1H8
Date Received: 02 Apr 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:17 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2018 |