THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:53:04 AM
Puglia, Marco Amedeo
CPSO#:
80769
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Room 2F51
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76733
Fax: (905) 523-6048
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCO AMEDEO PUGLIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGLIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2008 |