THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:33:34 PM
Casault, David Joseph Renald
CPSO#:
80768
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne st W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: (855) 844-1074
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Jul 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JOSEPH RENALD CASAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASAULT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2012 |