THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:15:05 PM
Dixon, Anthony Richard
CPSO#:
80763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Oct 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:04 Nov 2020 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY RICHARD DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2007 |