THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:45:54 AM
Ballard, Tonya Gale
CPSO#:
80749
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Cambridge Centre for Health
and Wellness
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Bouelvard
Cambridge ON N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 624-5999
Fax: 519-624-1117
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TONYA GALE BALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |