THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:27:23 PM
Lim, Ki Dong
CPSO#:
80746
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Health Centre
1060 Speers Road, Suite 215
Oakville ON L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 842-6084
Fax: (905) 842-4579
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KI DONG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |