THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:36:00 AM
Ziradkar, Jyotsna Shailendra
CPSO#:
80744
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Doctors Medical Walk-in Clinic
Suite 105
641 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6C 2T9
Phone: (519) 686-8585
Fax: (519) 686-8580
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JYOTSNA SHAILENDRA ZIRADKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIRADKAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
EL - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2008 |