THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:10:19 AM
Alhusayen, Ra'ed Omar S
CPSO#:
80735
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room M1 700
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RA'ED OMAR S ALHUSAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHUSAYEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PEAP - R - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2011 |