THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:39:49 PM
Zabtia, Nazar R
CPSO#:
80717
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate
Unit 221
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: (289) 813 6236
Fax: (289) 837 2168
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAZAR R ZABTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZABTIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 23 Jul 2004
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 27 Jul 2005 to 26 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 27 Jul 2006 to 26 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 27 Jul 2007 to 26 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 27 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2009 |