THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:59:46 PM
Zolis, Lynne Ruddy
CPSO#:
80713
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tortorelli, Lynne Ruddy (used until: 19 Jul 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Yonge/York Mills Women's Clinic
Suite 100
36 York Mills Road
Toronto ON M2P 2E9
Phone: (416) 644-1404
Fax: (416) 644-1406
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Zolis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Dec 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LYNNE RUDDY ZOLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOLIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2010 |