THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:14:26 AM
Guerra, Luis Antonio Caldas
CPSO#:
80703
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Dec 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Paediatric Urology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1353
Fax: (613) 738-4271
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:02 Dec 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PEAP - CF - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Dec 2006
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Nov 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Nov 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Nov 2012 |
|
Active |