THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:41:44 PM
Rabinovich, Alexander
CPSO#:
80696
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304 Victoria Ave N
Suite 403
Hamilton ON L8L 5G4
Phone: (289) 389-8181
Fax: (289) 389-8111
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER RABINOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVICH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 2010 |