THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:03:20 AM
Pamula, Andrea
CPSO#:
80693
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Phone: 519-601-8621 Ext. 105
Fax: 519-204-0729
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA PAMULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMULA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2008 |