THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:07:00 PM
Motlagh, Bahareh
CPSO#:
80692
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3601 Hwy 7 East, Suite 203
Markham ON L3R 0M3
Phone: (905) 604-6227
Fax: (905) 604-6442
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:21 Jan 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BAHAREH MOTLAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTLAGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 22 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2009 |