THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:00:55 PM
El Keilani, Akram M I
CPSO#:
80658
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Garyounis University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 9734416 Ext. 33579
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AKRAM M I EL KEILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL KEILANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2004 to 23 Jun 2004
PEAP - R - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 24 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |