THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:42:23 AM
Alkherayf, Fahad Abdulmohsen E
CPSO#:
80643
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room C2218
Division of Neurosurgery
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10661
Fax: (613) 761-4833
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:20 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAHAD ABDULMOHSEN E ALKHERAYF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHERAYF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 10 May 2004 to 20 Jun 2004
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 21 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2011 |