THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:48:52 AM
Noble Wohlgemut, Matthew Angus
CPSO#:
80641
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wohlgemut, Matthew Angus (used until: 07 Aug 2005 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
230 Canboro Street
Smithville ON L0R 2A0
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Fax: (905) 957-2475
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANGUS NOBLE WOHLGEMUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOBLE WOHLGEMUT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 10 May 2004 to 24 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 May 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2005 |