THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:24:46 AM
Alfasi, Abdulghader Mohamed Abdulghader
CPSO#:
80636
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CPM Centres for Pain Management
100 - 1770 Woodward Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 3J2
Phone: (613) 755-2095
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:12 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULGHADER MOHAMED ABDULGHADER ALFASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFASI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 10 May 2004 to 20 Jun 2004
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 21 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 8 - Pain Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 26 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 8 - Pain Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Aug 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 8 - Pain Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 28 Feb 2021
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2021 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2023 |