THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:20:17 AM
Kizior-Hajduk, Anna Jadwiga
CPSO#:
80633
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hajduk, Anna Jadwiga Kizior (used until: 14 Sep 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON N1G 5J5
Phone: (519) 823-5133
Fax: (519) 827-0255
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNA JADWIGA KIZIOR-HAJDUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIZIOR-HAJDUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 10 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2004 |