THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:01:11 AM
Morel, Chantal France Joelle
CPSO#:
80624
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN MSH Fred A Litwin Family Centre
in Genetic Medicine
3rd Floor Room 400 Box 34
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4220
Fax: (416) 619-5523
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHANTAL FRANCE JOELLE MOREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 May 2004 to 30 May 2004
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2007 |