THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:37:20 AM
Marwaha, Gulshan
CPSO#:
80623
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: North Bengal Medical College, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Jul 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2004 to 28 Jun 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2023 |