THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:44:59 AM
Cho, Byoung Chun John
CPSO#:
80621
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Apr 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite 7-218
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-6513
Fax: 416 946 6566
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BYOUNG CHUN JOHN CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2004 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 6, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Byoung-Chun John Cho was charged with the following offences:
1. 2 counts of Assault on a named person, on or about December 26, 2021 and August 5, 2023, contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: August 6, 2023
Place of Charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 5, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 5, 2023, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Byoung-Chun John Cho:
1. Cho must notify specified police officer of any change to his address within 24 hours of such change.
2. Cho must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named person subject to specified exception.
3. Cho must not go to a specified location.
4. Cho must not go within 50 meters of a specified location.
5. Cho must not possess any weapons as defined by the Criminal Code.