THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:34:56 AM
Chawla, Jasmeet Singh
CPSO#:
80616
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Apr 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nephrology |
Effective:31 Dec 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASMEET SINGH CHAWLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAWLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 May 2004 to 28 May 2004
EL - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 29 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
EL - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2005 |