THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:29:18 PM
Liu, Kimberly Ellen
CPSO#:
80612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Fertility
Suite 700
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON M5T 2Z5
Phone: (416) 586-5367
Fax: (416) 586-4686
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ELLEN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 May 2004 to 28 May 2004
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
EL - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |