THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:13:32 AM
Burneo de las Casas, Jorge Guillermo
CPSO#:
80599
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Feb 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Division of Neurology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3464
Fax: (519) 663-3498
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Peru
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:03 Dec 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Apr 2004 to 04 Feb 2005
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
|
Active |