THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:06:51 AM
Kamal, Fadi Abdullah Bakr
CPSO#:
80585
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 533-6964
Fax: (519) 533-6965
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:07 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FADI ABDULLAH BAKR KAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 May 2004 to 15 Jun 2004
PEAP - R - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2012 |