THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:43:06 AM
Skaro, Anton Ivan
CPSO#:
80574
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Room C4 211
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32904
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:15 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTON IVAN SKARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKARO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
EL - Solid Organ Transplantation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2016 |